Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2617
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1657
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1657
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 825
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1034
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#82
|
Journal Page: 1006
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1006
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1006
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 976
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Leibowitz
|
Journal Page: 976
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 976
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 885
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2009
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 302
|
House
|
02/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 302
|
House
|
11/25/2008
|
Filed
|
|
|