Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB350 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Leibowitz, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Van de Putte) H.B. No. 350
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 1, 2009;
 April 27, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 20, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 5, Nays 1; May 20, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to use of school district resources for athletic or
 instructional facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 11.168, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 11.168. USE OF DISTRICT RESOURCES PROHIBITED FOR
 CERTAIN PURPOSES. Except as provided by Section 45.109(a-1), the
 [The] board of trustees of a school district may not enter into an
 agreement authorizing the use of school district employees,
 property, or resources for the provision of materials or labor for
 the design, construction, or renovation of improvements to real
 property not owned or leased by the district.
 SECTION 2. Section 45.109, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  An independent school district and an institution of
 higher education, as defined by Section 61.003, located wholly or
 partially in the boundaries of the county in which the district is
 located may contract for the district to contribute district
 resources to pay a portion of the costs of the design or
 construction of an instructional facility or a stadium or other
 athletic facilities owned by or under the control of the
 institution of higher education. A district may contribute
 district resources under this subsection only if the district and
 the institution of higher education enter into a written agreement
 authorizing the district to use that facility.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *