E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6979
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6967
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6975
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6900
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4993
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4993
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4985
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6133
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6119
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4764
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5986
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5986
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4492
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4492
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4424
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4424
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4424
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5388
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5388
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5388
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5120
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3181
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3181
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3181
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3181
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3181
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3181
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3181
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2617
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Referred to Administration
|
|
Journal Page: 2302
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2302
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2105
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2871
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2578
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#587
|
Journal Page: 2577
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2577
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Naishtat
|
Journal Page: 2576
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2576
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2513
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2513
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Amended
|
5-Vaught
|
Journal Page: 2512
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Point of order sustained (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 2512
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
4-Naishtat
|
Journal Page: 2511
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
3-Gutierrez
|
Journal Page: 2510
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2510
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/5/09 3:30 PM
|
Journal Page: 2489
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2485
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1719
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 793
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 793
|
House
|
03/12/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|