Senate | 05/13/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 2353 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2353 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2240 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3441 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Record vote | RV#700 | Journal Page: 3053 |
House | 05/11/2009 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 3053 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Amended | 1-Callegari | Journal Page: 3053 |
House | 05/11/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3053 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3018 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3018 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Amended | 1-McReynolds | Journal Page: 3018 |
House | 05/08/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3018 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2594 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2135 | |
House | 04/02/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/19/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 798 | |
House | 03/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 798 | |
House | 03/12/2009 | Filed |