House | 05/06/2009 | Postponed | 7/6/10 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2589 |
House | 05/06/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2589 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2525 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2525 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Amended | 2-Isett | Journal Page: 2525 |
House | 05/05/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2524 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1872 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/19/2009 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 798 | |
House | 03/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 798 | |
House | 03/12/2009 | Filed |