Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 2565
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2565
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2459
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 4079
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3726
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#875
|
Journal Page: 3726
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3726
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3726
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3696
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3696
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3042
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2009
|
Subcommittee members named
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2009
|
Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 882
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 882
|
House
|
03/13/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|