E
|
06/16/2009
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/16/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6978
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5153
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6896
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6975
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4475
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5597
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1460
|
Journal Page: 5597
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5597
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5163
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 4096
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3910
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3910
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3910
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3910
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3909
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3909
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3909
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 3495
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 2138
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2138
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2058
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2674
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2466
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#548
|
Journal Page: 2465
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2465
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2465
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2416
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#537
|
Journal Page: 2416
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2416
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
1-Keffer
|
Journal Page: 2415
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2415
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Calendars Committee rule adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 2159
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1719
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 1143
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1143
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#111
|
Journal Page: 1080
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Permission to introduce
|
|
Journal Page: 1080
|