1 | 1 | | H.B. No. 4765 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to the computation of the franchise tax. |
---|
6 | 6 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
7 | 7 | | SECTION 1. (a) Section 171.002(d), Tax Code, is amended to |
---|
8 | 8 | | read as follows: |
---|
9 | 9 | | (d) A taxable entity is not required to pay any tax and is |
---|
10 | 10 | | not considered to owe any tax for a period if: |
---|
11 | 11 | | (1) the amount of tax computed for the taxable entity |
---|
12 | 12 | | is less than $1,000; or |
---|
13 | 13 | | (2) the amount of the taxable entity's total revenue |
---|
14 | 14 | | from its entire business is less than or equal to $1 million |
---|
15 | 15 | | [$300,000] or the amount determined under Section 171.006 per |
---|
16 | 16 | | 12-month period on which margin is based. |
---|
17 | 17 | | (b) This section takes effect only if H.B. No. 2154, Acts of |
---|
18 | 18 | | the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, amends Section |
---|
19 | 19 | | 155.0211, Tax Code, in a manner that results in an increase in the |
---|
20 | 20 | | revenue from the tax under that section during the state fiscal |
---|
21 | 21 | | biennium beginning September 1, 2009, that is attributable to that |
---|
22 | 22 | | change, and that Act is enacted and becomes law. If H.B. No. 2154, |
---|
23 | 23 | | Acts of the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, does not amend |
---|
24 | 24 | | Section 155.0211, Tax Code, in that manner or is not enacted or does |
---|
25 | 25 | | not become law, this section has no effect. |
---|
26 | 26 | | (c) If this section takes effect, this section expires |
---|
27 | 27 | | December 31, 2011. |
---|
28 | 28 | | (d) This section applies only to a report originally due on |
---|
29 | 29 | | or after the effective date of this section. |
---|
30 | 30 | | SECTION 2. (a) Section 171.002(d), Tax Code, is amended to |
---|
31 | 31 | | read as follows: |
---|
32 | 32 | | (d) A taxable entity is not required to pay any tax and is |
---|
33 | 33 | | not considered to owe any tax for a period if: |
---|
34 | 34 | | (1) the amount of tax computed for the taxable entity |
---|
35 | 35 | | is less than $1,000; or |
---|
36 | 36 | | (2) the amount of the taxable entity's total revenue |
---|
37 | 37 | | from its entire business is less than or equal to $600,000 |
---|
38 | 38 | | [$300,000] or the amount determined under Section 171.006 per |
---|
39 | 39 | | 12-month period on which margin is based. |
---|
40 | 40 | | (b) This section takes effect January 1, 2012, if H.B. No. |
---|
41 | 41 | | 2154, Acts of the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, amends |
---|
42 | 42 | | Section 155.0211, Tax Code, in a manner that results in an increase |
---|
43 | 43 | | in the revenue from the tax under that section during the state |
---|
44 | 44 | | fiscal biennium beginning September 1, 2009, that is attributable |
---|
45 | 45 | | to that change, and that Act is enacted and becomes law. If H.B. No. |
---|
46 | 46 | | 2154, Acts of the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, does not |
---|
47 | 47 | | amend Section 155.0211, Tax Code, in that manner or is not enacted |
---|
48 | 48 | | or does not become law, this section takes effect January 1, 2010. |
---|
49 | 49 | | (c) This section applies only to a report originally due on |
---|
50 | 50 | | or after the effective date of this section. |
---|
51 | 51 | | SECTION 3. (a) Section 171.0021(a), Tax Code, is amended to |
---|
52 | 52 | | read as follows: |
---|
53 | 53 | | (a) A taxable entity is entitled to a discount of the tax |
---|
54 | 54 | | imposed under this chapter that the taxable entity is required to |
---|
55 | 55 | | pay after determining its taxable margin under Section 171.101, |
---|
56 | 56 | | applying the appropriate rate of the tax under Section 171.002(a) |
---|
57 | 57 | | or (b), and subtracting any other allowable credits, as follows: |
---|
58 | 58 | | (1) [for a taxable entity for which the total revenue |
---|
59 | 59 | | from its entire business is greater than $300,000 but less than |
---|
60 | 60 | | $400,000, the taxable entity is entitled to a discount of 80 |
---|
61 | 61 | | percent; |
---|
62 | 62 | | [(2) for a taxable entity for which the total revenue |
---|
63 | 63 | | from its entire business is equal to or greater than $400,000 but |
---|
64 | 64 | | less than $500,000, the taxable entity is entitled to a discount of |
---|
65 | 65 | | 60 percent; |
---|
66 | 66 | | [(3)] for a taxable entity for which the total revenue |
---|
67 | 67 | | from its entire business is [equal to or] greater than $600,000 |
---|
68 | 68 | | [$500,000] but less than $700,000, the taxable entity is entitled |
---|
69 | 69 | | to a discount of 40 percent; and |
---|
70 | 70 | | (2) [(4)] for a taxable entity for which the total |
---|
71 | 71 | | revenue from its entire business is equal to or greater than |
---|
72 | 72 | | $700,000 but less than $900,000, the taxable entity is entitled to a |
---|
73 | 73 | | discount of 20 percent. |
---|
74 | 74 | | (b) This section takes effect January 1, 2012, if H.B. No. |
---|
75 | 75 | | 2154, Acts of the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, amends |
---|
76 | 76 | | Section 155.0211, Tax Code, in a manner that results in an increase |
---|
77 | 77 | | in the revenue from the tax under that section during the state |
---|
78 | 78 | | fiscal biennium beginning September 1, 2009, that is attributable |
---|
79 | 79 | | to that change, and that Act is enacted and becomes law. If H.B. No. |
---|
80 | 80 | | 2154, Acts of the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, does not |
---|
81 | 81 | | amend Section 155.0211, Tax Code, in that manner or is not enacted |
---|
82 | 82 | | or does not become law, this section takes effect January 1, 2010. |
---|
83 | 83 | | (c) This section applies only to a report originally due on |
---|
84 | 84 | | or after the effective date of this section. |
---|
85 | 85 | | SECTION 4. Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this |
---|
86 | 86 | | Act takes effect January 1, 2010. |
---|
87 | 87 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
88 | 88 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
89 | 89 | | I certify that H.B. No. 4765 was passed by the House on May 5, |
---|
90 | 90 | | 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 0, 1 present, not |
---|
91 | 91 | | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
92 | 92 | | No. 4765 on May 29, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 1, |
---|
93 | 93 | | 1 present, not voting. |
---|
94 | 94 | | ______________________________ |
---|
95 | 95 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
96 | 96 | | I certify that H.B. No. 4765 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
97 | 97 | | amendments, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays |
---|
98 | 98 | | 1. |
---|
99 | 99 | | ______________________________ |
---|
100 | 100 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
101 | 101 | | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
102 | 102 | | Date |
---|
103 | 103 | | __________________ |
---|
104 | 104 | | Governor |
---|