Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB4765 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 4765


 AN ACT
 relating to the computation of the franchise tax.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. (a) Section 171.002(d), Tax Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (d) A taxable entity is not required to pay any tax and is
 not considered to owe any tax for a period if:
 (1) the amount of tax computed for the taxable entity
 is less than $1,000; or
 (2) the amount of the taxable entity's total revenue
 from its entire business is less than or equal to $1 million
 [$300,000] or the amount determined under Section 171.006 per
 12-month period on which margin is based.
 (b) This section takes effect only if H.B. No. 2154, Acts of
 the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, amends Section
 155.0211, Tax Code, in a manner that results in an increase in the
 revenue from the tax under that section during the state fiscal
 biennium beginning September 1, 2009, that is attributable to that
 change, and that Act is enacted and becomes law. If H.B. No. 2154,
 Acts of the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, does not amend
 Section 155.0211, Tax Code, in that manner or is not enacted or does
 not become law, this section has no effect.
 (c) If this section takes effect, this section expires
 December 31, 2011.
 (d) This section applies only to a report originally due on
 or after the effective date of this section.
 SECTION 2. (a) Section 171.002(d), Tax Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (d) A taxable entity is not required to pay any tax and is
 not considered to owe any tax for a period if:
 (1) the amount of tax computed for the taxable entity
 is less than $1,000; or
 (2) the amount of the taxable entity's total revenue
 from its entire business is less than or equal to $600,000
 [$300,000] or the amount determined under Section 171.006 per
 12-month period on which margin is based.
 (b) This section takes effect January 1, 2012, if H.B. No.
 2154, Acts of the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, amends
 Section 155.0211, Tax Code, in a manner that results in an increase
 in the revenue from the tax under that section during the state
 fiscal biennium beginning September 1, 2009, that is attributable
 to that change, and that Act is enacted and becomes law. If H.B. No.
 2154, Acts of the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, does not
 amend Section 155.0211, Tax Code, in that manner or is not enacted
 or does not become law, this section takes effect January 1, 2010.
 (c) This section applies only to a report originally due on
 or after the effective date of this section.
 SECTION 3. (a) Section 171.0021(a), Tax Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a) A taxable entity is entitled to a discount of the tax
 imposed under this chapter that the taxable entity is required to
 pay after determining its taxable margin under Section 171.101,
 applying the appropriate rate of the tax under Section 171.002(a)
 or (b), and subtracting any other allowable credits, as follows:
 (1) [for a taxable entity for which the total revenue
 from its entire business is greater than $300,000 but less than
 $400,000, the taxable entity is entitled to a discount of 80
 percent;
 [(2)     for a taxable entity for which the total revenue
 from its entire business is equal to or greater than $400,000 but
 less than $500,000, the taxable entity is entitled to a discount of
 60 percent;
 [(3)] for a taxable entity for which the total revenue
 from its entire business is [equal to or] greater than $600,000
 [$500,000] but less than $700,000, the taxable entity is entitled
 to a discount of 40 percent; and
 (2) [(4)] for a taxable entity for which the total
 revenue from its entire business is equal to or greater than
 $700,000 but less than $900,000, the taxable entity is entitled to a
 discount of 20 percent.
 (b) This section takes effect January 1, 2012, if H.B. No.
 2154, Acts of the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, amends
 Section 155.0211, Tax Code, in a manner that results in an increase
 in the revenue from the tax under that section during the state
 fiscal biennium beginning September 1, 2009, that is attributable
 to that change, and that Act is enacted and becomes law. If H.B. No.
 2154, Acts of the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, does not
 amend Section 155.0211, Tax Code, in that manner or is not enacted
 or does not become law, this section takes effect January 1, 2010.
 (c) This section applies only to a report originally due on
 or after the effective date of this section.
 SECTION 4. Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this
 Act takes effect January 1, 2010.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 4765 was passed by the House on May 5,
 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 4765 on May 29, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 1,
 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 4765 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays
 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor