E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6978
|
E
|
06/04/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5153
|
House
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6967
|
House
|
06/03/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6976
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6971
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 5090
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5090
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5042
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1695
|
Journal Page: 6665
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6664
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4960
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6034
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6034
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4599
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4599
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4522
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4522
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4522
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5740
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5740
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5740
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5210
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 3185
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3079
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3079
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3079
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3079
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3079
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3079
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3079
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Van de Putte
|
Journal Page: 3076
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3074
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3074
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2876
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2442
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1993
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1993
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1716
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2217
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#335
|
Journal Page: 1948
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1948
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1948
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1934
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1934
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1719
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2009
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 328
|
House
|
02/18/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 328
|
House
|
01/14/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|