1 | 1 | | H.B. No. 635 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to the authority of the Texas Education Agency to seek, |
---|
6 | 6 | | accept, determine eligibility for, and distribute grants available |
---|
7 | 7 | | for the benefit of public education and the establishment of |
---|
8 | 8 | | professional development institutes and payment of grants to |
---|
9 | 9 | | teachers who complete those institutes. |
---|
10 | 10 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
11 | 11 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 7, Education Code, is |
---|
12 | 12 | | amended by adding Section 7.031 to read as follows: |
---|
13 | 13 | | Sec. 7.031. GRANTS. (a) The agency may seek, accept, and |
---|
14 | 14 | | distribute grants awarded by the federal government or any other |
---|
15 | 15 | | public or private entity for the benefit of public education, |
---|
16 | 16 | | subject to the limitations or conditions imposed by the terms of the |
---|
17 | 17 | | grants or by other law. |
---|
18 | 18 | | (b) Unless otherwise prohibited by federal law, the |
---|
19 | 19 | | commissioner may determine, solely for purposes of the program's |
---|
20 | 20 | | eligibility to receive federal grant funds, for the purpose of |
---|
21 | 21 | | technology services and support, that a Head Start program operated |
---|
22 | 22 | | in this state by a school district or a community-based |
---|
23 | 23 | | organization serves the function of an elementary school by |
---|
24 | 24 | | providing elementary education at one or more program facilities. |
---|
25 | 25 | | (c) A determination by the commissioner under Subsection |
---|
26 | 26 | | (b): |
---|
27 | 27 | | (1) does not entitle a Head Start program to receive |
---|
28 | 28 | | state funds for which the program would not otherwise be eligible; |
---|
29 | 29 | | (2) may not reduce the amount of federal grant funds |
---|
30 | 30 | | available for school districts and open-enrollment charter |
---|
31 | 31 | | schools; and |
---|
32 | 32 | | (3) may not be appealed. |
---|
33 | 33 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
34 | 34 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
35 | 35 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
36 | 36 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
37 | 37 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
38 | 38 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
39 | 39 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
40 | 40 | | I certify that H.B. No. 635 was passed by the House on April |
---|
41 | 41 | | 28, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 149, Nays 0, 1 present, not |
---|
42 | 42 | | voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to |
---|
43 | 43 | | H.B. No. 635 on May 29, 2009, and requested the appointment of a |
---|
44 | 44 | | conference committee to consider the differences between the two |
---|
45 | 45 | | houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report |
---|
46 | 46 | | on H.B. No. 635 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 143, |
---|
47 | 47 | | Nays 0, 2 present, not voting. |
---|
48 | 48 | | ______________________________ |
---|
49 | 49 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
50 | 50 | | I certify that H.B. No. 635 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
51 | 51 | | amendments, on May 25, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
52 | 52 | | 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference |
---|
53 | 53 | | committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and |
---|
54 | 54 | | that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. |
---|
55 | 55 | | 635 on June 1, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
56 | 56 | | ______________________________ |
---|
57 | 57 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
58 | 58 | | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
59 | 59 | | Date |
---|
60 | 60 | | __________________ |
---|
61 | 61 | | Governor |
---|