H.B. No. 635 AN ACT relating to the authority of the Texas Education Agency to seek, accept, determine eligibility for, and distribute grants available for the benefit of public education and the establishment of professional development institutes and payment of grants to teachers who complete those institutes. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 7, Education Code, is amended by adding Section 7.031 to read as follows: Sec. 7.031. GRANTS. (a) The agency may seek, accept, and distribute grants awarded by the federal government or any other public or private entity for the benefit of public education, subject to the limitations or conditions imposed by the terms of the grants or by other law. (b) Unless otherwise prohibited by federal law, the commissioner may determine, solely for purposes of the program's eligibility to receive federal grant funds, for the purpose of technology services and support, that a Head Start program operated in this state by a school district or a community-based organization serves the function of an elementary school by providing elementary education at one or more program facilities. (c) A determination by the commissioner under Subsection (b): (1) does not entitle a Head Start program to receive state funds for which the program would not otherwise be eligible; (2) may not reduce the amount of federal grant funds available for school districts and open-enrollment charter schools; and (3) may not be appealed. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 635 was passed by the House on April 28, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 149, Nays 0, 1 present, not voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 635 on May 29, 2009, and requested the appointment of a conference committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. 635 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 0, 2 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 635 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 25, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. 635 on June 1, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor