E | 05/26/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5164 | |
E | 05/18/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4079 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2492 | |
House | 05/18/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3947 | |
House | 05/18/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4079 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3717 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 2441 | |
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 744 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 928 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 928 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 849 | |
House | 03/18/2009 | Filed |