E | 05/20/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4316 | |
E | 05/12/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3441 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2197 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3171 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3302 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 2867 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 2139 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2106 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2679 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2679 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 929 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 849 | |
House | 03/18/2009 | Filed |