E | 05/13/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3680 | |
E | 05/01/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2337 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1902 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2296 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2337 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 2133 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 1763 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 870 | |
House | 04/02/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1043 | |
House | 04/02/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1043 | |
House | 04/02/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 961 | |
House | 03/24/2009 | Filed |