E | 04/24/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1930 | |
E | 04/14/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1236 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 998 | |
House | 04/14/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 1206 | |
House | 04/13/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1207 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 1169 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 978 | |
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 905 | |
House | 04/07/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1096 | |
House | 04/07/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 1096 | |
House | 04/07/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 979 | |
House | 03/25/2009 | Filed |