Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR138 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 138


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Countless lives were touched by Orange Grove
 educator Roxie M. Fine, who passed away on December 2, 2008, at the
 age of 45; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Corpus Christi on May 3, 1963, to Mary Nan
 and Johnny Marek, Roxie Fine graduated from Calallen High School in
 1981 and subsequently earned a bachelor's degree in family and
 consumer sciences from Texas State University; she began her
 teaching career at Banquete High School, where she was recognized
 as the Banquete ISD Teacher of the Year, before joining the faculty
 of Orange Grove High School in 1994; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. Fine impressed students with her energy and
 kindness, and in just one year, the school's enrollment in family
 and consumer sciences courses doubled; to accommodate the growth,
 the school hired Mrs. Fine's sister and fellow teacher, Kaye
 Bluntzer, and together, the two women grew the Family, Career, and
 Community Leaders of America program from 10 members to more than
 250; Mrs. Fine's enthusiasm for FCCLA was well known, and in 2007
 she was asked to serve as one of five national consultants for the
 organization; she helped lead training events several times a year,
 and her positive influence was felt by FCCLA professionals around
 the country; and
 WHEREAS, Active in her community as well, this esteemed Texan
 shared her time and talents as a leader in the Jim Wells County 4-H
 program and was a devoted member of St. John of the Cross Catholic
 Church; in addition, she shared a rewarding relationship with her
 husband, Aaron Fine, with whom she was blessed with a son, Ashton;
 and
 WHEREAS, With her luminous smile and zest for life, Roxie
 Fine brought great joy to all those who were privileged to know her;
 although her life ended far too soon, she leaves behind a legacy
 that will continue to inspire others for many years to come; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the life of Roxie M. Fine and extend sincere
 sympathy to the members of her family: to her husband, Aaron Fine;
 to her son, Ashton Fine; to her sister, Kaye Bluntzer and her
 husband, Eric; to her brother-in-law and sister-in-law, Loren and
 Debbie Fine; to her nieces and nephews, Gus, Arlis, and Mary Grace
 Bluntzer and Lexus and Chaliis Fine; and to her other relatives and
 many friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Roxie M. Fine.
 Gonzalez Toureilles
 Straus Gattis Menendez Straus Gattis Menendez
Straus Gattis Menendez
 Allen Geren Merritt Allen Geren Merritt
Allen Geren Merritt
 Alonzo Giddings Miklos Alonzo Giddings Miklos
Alonzo Giddings Miklos
 Alvarado Gonzales Miller of Comal Alvarado Gonzales Miller of Comal
Alvarado Gonzales Miller of Comal
 Anchia Gonzalez Toureilles Miller of Erath Anchia Gonzalez Toureilles Miller of Erath
Anchia Gonzalez Toureilles Miller of Erath
 Anderson Guillen Moody Anderson Guillen Moody
Anderson Guillen Moody
 Aycock Gutierrez Morrison Aycock Gutierrez Morrison
Aycock Gutierrez Morrison
 Berman Hamilton Naishtat Berman Hamilton Naishtat
Berman Hamilton Naishtat
 Bohac Hancock Oliveira Bohac Hancock Oliveira
Bohac Hancock Oliveira
 Bolton Hardcastle Olivo Bolton Hardcastle Olivo
Bolton Hardcastle Olivo
 Bonnen Harless Orr Bonnen Harless Orr
Bonnen Harless Orr
 Branch Harper-Brown Ortiz, Jr. Branch Harper-Brown Ortiz, Jr.
Branch Harper-Brown Ortiz, Jr.
 Brown of Kaufman Hartnett Otto Brown of Kaufman Hartnett Otto
Brown of Kaufman Hartnett Otto
 Brown of Brazos Heflin Parker Brown of Brazos Heflin Parker
Brown of Brazos Heflin Parker
 Burnam Hernandez Patrick Burnam Hernandez Patrick
Burnam Hernandez Patrick
 Button Herrero Paxton Button Herrero Paxton
Button Herrero Paxton
 Callegari Hilderbran Pea Callegari Hilderbran Pea
Callegari Hilderbran Pea
 Castro Hochberg Phillips Castro Hochberg Phillips
Castro Hochberg Phillips
 Chavez Hodge Pickett Chavez Hodge Pickett
Chavez Hodge Pickett
 Chisum Homer Pierson Chisum Homer Pierson
Chisum Homer Pierson
 Christian Hopson Pitts Christian Hopson Pitts
Christian Hopson Pitts
 Cohen Howard of Fort Bend Quintanilla Cohen Howard of Fort Bend Quintanilla
Cohen Howard of Fort Bend Quintanilla
 Coleman Howard of Travis Raymond Coleman Howard of Travis Raymond
Coleman Howard of Travis Raymond
 Cook Hughes Riddle Cook Hughes Riddle
Cook Hughes Riddle
 Corte Hunter Rios Ybarra Corte Hunter Rios Ybarra
Corte Hunter Rios Ybarra
 Crabb Isett Ritter Crabb Isett Ritter
Crabb Isett Ritter
 Craddick Jackson Rodriguez Craddick Jackson Rodriguez
Craddick Jackson Rodriguez
 Creighton Jones Rose Creighton Jones Rose
Creighton Jones Rose
 Crownover Keffer Sheffield Crownover Keffer Sheffield
Crownover Keffer Sheffield
 Darby Kent Shelton Darby Kent Shelton
Darby Kent Shelton
 Davis of Harris King of Parker Smith of Tarrant Davis of Harris King of Parker Smith of Tarrant
Davis of Harris King of Parker Smith of Tarrant
 Davis of Dallas King of Taylor Smith of Harris Davis of Dallas King of Taylor Smith of Harris
Davis of Dallas King of Taylor Smith of Harris
 Deshotel King of Zavala Smithee Deshotel King of Zavala Smithee
Deshotel King of Zavala Smithee
 Driver Kleinschmidt Solomons Driver Kleinschmidt Solomons
Driver Kleinschmidt Solomons
 Dukes Kolkhorst Strama Dukes Kolkhorst Strama
Dukes Kolkhorst Strama
 Dunnam Kuempel Swinford Dunnam Kuempel Swinford
Dunnam Kuempel Swinford
 Dutton Laubenberg Taylor Dutton Laubenberg Taylor
Dutton Laubenberg Taylor
 Edwards Legler Thibaut Edwards Legler Thibaut
Edwards Legler Thibaut
 Eiland Leibowitz Thompson Eiland Leibowitz Thompson
Eiland Leibowitz Thompson
 Eissler Lewis Truitt Eissler Lewis Truitt
Eissler Lewis Truitt
 Elkins Lucio III Turner of Tarrant Elkins Lucio III Turner of Tarrant
Elkins Lucio III Turner of Tarrant
 England Madden Turner of Harris England Madden Turner of Harris
England Madden Turner of Harris
 Farabee Maldonado Vaught Farabee Maldonado Vaught
Farabee Maldonado Vaught
 Farias Mallory Caraway Veasey Farias Mallory Caraway Veasey
Farias Mallory Caraway Veasey
 Farrar Marquez Villarreal Farrar Marquez Villarreal
Farrar Marquez Villarreal
 Fletcher Martinez Vo Fletcher Martinez Vo
Fletcher Martinez Vo
 Flores Martinez Fischer Walle Flores Martinez Fischer Walle
Flores Martinez Fischer Walle
 Flynn McCall Weber Flynn McCall Weber
Flynn McCall Weber
 Frost McClendon Woolley Frost McClendon Woolley
Frost McClendon Woolley
 Gallego McReynolds Zerwas Gallego McReynolds Zerwas
Gallego McReynolds Zerwas
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 138 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on April 7, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 138 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on April 8, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor



Straus Gattis Menendez

Allen Geren Merritt

Alonzo Giddings Miklos

Alvarado Gonzales Miller of Comal

Anchia Gonzalez Toureilles Miller of Erath

Anderson Guillen Moody

Aycock Gutierrez Morrison

Berman Hamilton Naishtat

Bohac Hancock Oliveira

Bolton Hardcastle Olivo

Bonnen Harless Orr

Branch Harper-Brown Ortiz, Jr.

Brown of Kaufman Hartnett Otto

Brown of Brazos Heflin Parker

Burnam Hernandez Patrick

Button Herrero Paxton

Callegari Hilderbran Pea

Castro Hochberg Phillips

Chavez Hodge Pickett

Chisum Homer Pierson

Christian Hopson Pitts

Cohen Howard of Fort Bend Quintanilla

Coleman Howard of Travis Raymond

Cook Hughes Riddle

Corte Hunter Rios Ybarra

Crabb Isett Ritter

Craddick Jackson Rodriguez

Creighton Jones Rose

Crownover Keffer Sheffield

Darby Kent Shelton

Davis of Harris King of Parker Smith of Tarrant

Davis of Dallas King of Taylor Smith of Harris

Deshotel King of Zavala Smithee

Driver Kleinschmidt Solomons

Dukes Kolkhorst Strama

Dunnam Kuempel Swinford

Dutton Laubenberg Taylor

Edwards Legler Thibaut

Eiland Leibowitz Thompson

Eissler Lewis Truitt

Elkins Lucio III Turner of Tarrant

England Madden Turner of Harris

Farabee Maldonado Vaught

Farias Mallory Caraway Veasey

Farrar Marquez Villarreal

Fletcher Martinez Vo

Flores Martinez Fischer Walle

Flynn McCall Weber

Frost McClendon Woolley

Gallego McReynolds Zerwas