E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6980 | |
E | 05/25/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4992 | |
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Signed in the Senate | ||
House | 05/23/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4569 | |
House | 05/23/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4641 | |
House | 05/20/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4218 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 2616 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1078 | |
House | 04/16/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1243 | |
House | 04/16/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1243 | |
House | 04/16/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 1120 | |
House | 04/02/2009 | Filed |