Senate | 05/31/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 4983 | |
House | 05/30/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 6902 | |
House | 05/30/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 6006 | |
House | 05/30/2009 | Record vote | RV#1544 | Journal Page: 6005 |
House | 05/30/2009 | Adopted as amended | Journal Page: 6005 | |
House | 05/30/2009 | Amended | 3-Veasey | Journal Page: 6005 |
House | 05/30/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 6004 | |
House | 05/23/2009 | Placed on Resolutions Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4315 | |
House | 05/20/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Returned to committee | Journal Page: 4054 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Point of order sustained | Rule 4, Section 18 | Journal Page: 4054 |
House | 05/19/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 4054 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Placed on Resolutions Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1930 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 392 | |
House | 02/17/2009 | Filed |