Senate | 05/27/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 2394 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1025 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1025 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 870 | |
House | 04/01/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1072 | |
House | 04/01/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1026 | |
House | 04/01/2009 | Record vote | RV#87 | Journal Page: 1026 |
House | 04/01/2009 | Adopted as amended | Journal Page: 1026 | |
House | 04/01/2009 | Amended | 2-Phillips | Journal Page: 1025 |
House | 04/01/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1025 | |
House | 04/01/2009 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/27/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 989 | |
House | 03/24/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/02/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 511 | |
House | 03/02/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 511 | |
House | 11/24/2008 | Filed |