Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HJR29 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Elkins, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Wentworth) H.J.R. No. 29
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 2, 2009;
 April 15, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 14, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 1;
 May 14, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.J.R. No. 29 By: Lucio


 HOUSE JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment to allow the legislature to
 override a veto of the governor following a legislative session.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 14, Article IV, Texas Constitution, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 14. (a) Every bill which shall have passed both
 houses of the Legislature shall be presented to the Governor for his
 approval. If he approve he shall sign it; but if he disapprove it,
 he shall return it, with his objections, to the House in which it
 originated, which House shall enter the objections at large upon
 its journal, and proceed to reconsider it. If after such
 reconsideration, two-thirds of the members present agree to pass
 the bill, it shall be sent, with the objections, to the other House,
 by which likewise it shall be reconsidered; and, if approved by
 two-thirds of the members of that House, it shall become a law; but
 in such cases the votes of both Houses shall be determined by yeas
 and nays, and the names of the members voting for and against the
 bill shall be entered on the journal of each House respectively.
 (b) If any bill shall not be returned by the Governor with
 his objections within ten days (Sundays excepted) after it shall
 have been presented to him, the same shall be a law, in like manner
 as if he had signed it, unless the Legislature, by its adjournment,
 prevent its return, in which case it shall be a law, unless he shall
 file the same, with his objections, in the office of the Secretary
 of State and give notice thereof by public proclamation within
 twenty days after such adjournment.
 (c) If any bill presented to the Governor contains several
 items of appropriation he may object to one or more of such items,
 and approve the other portion of the bill. In such case he shall
 append to the bill, at the time of signing it, a statement of the
 items to which he objects, and no item so objected to shall take
 effect. If the Legislature be in session, he shall transmit to the
 House in which the bill originated a copy of such statement and the
 items objected to shall be separately considered. If, on
 reconsideration, one or more of such items be approved by
 two-thirds of the members present of each House, the same shall be
 part of the law, notwithstanding the objections of the Governor. If
 any such bill, containing several items of appropriation, not
 having been presented to the Governor ten days (Sundays excepted)
 prior to adjournment, be in the hands of the Governor at the time of
 adjournment, he shall have twenty days from such adjournment within
 which to file objections to any items thereof and make proclamation
 of the same, and such item or items shall not take effect.
 (d)  On the call of the presiding officers of both Houses of
 the Legislature as provided by Subsection (e) of this section, the
 Legislature shall convene to reconsider any bill disapproved by the
 Governor under Subsection (a) of this section or any item of
 appropriation in a bill to which the Governor objects under
 Subsection (c) of this section if the bill or statement of objection
 to the item of appropriation is:
 (1)  returned to the House in which the bill originated
 on or after the third day before the date of adjournment of the
 session at which the bill was passed; or
 (2)  filed with the Secretary of State after the
 adjournment of the session at which the bill was passed.
 (e)  Not later than the fifth day following the last day on
 which the Governor is authorized to file a disapproval of a bill or
 objection to an item of appropriation with the Secretary of State
 under this section after adjournment of the Legislature, a member
 of either House in writing filed with the chief clerk or secretary
 of that House may request the presiding officer of that House to
 call the Legislature into session as provided by Subsection (f) of
 this section to reconsider one or more bills or items of
 appropriation described by Subsection (d) of this section. If and
 only if a majority of the members of either House file requests with
 the applicable chief clerk or secretary within that period, the
 presiding officers of both Houses shall jointly call the
 Legislature into session for purposes of Subsection (d).
 (f)  The period for reconsideration under Subsection (d) of
 this section begins at 10 a.m. on the second Tuesday following the
 last day on which the Governor is authorized to file a disapproval
 or objection with the Secretary of State and may not exceed three
 consecutive days. During this period, unless the Legislature has
 been called into special session by the Governor, the Legislature
 may not consider any subject other than the reconsideration of
 bills or items of appropriation described by Subsection (d) of this
 section.  Reconsideration of a bill or item of appropriation during
 this period is conducted in the manner provided by Subsection (a) or
 (c) of this section, as applicable.
 SECTION 2. This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 3, 2009.
 The ballot shall be printed to provide for voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment to allow the
 legislature to override a veto of the governor following a
 legislative session."
 * * * * *