House | 04/17/2009 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1240 | |
House | 04/16/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 1240 | |
House | 04/16/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 1121 | |
House | 04/01/2009 | Filed |