House | 04/17/2009 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1278 | |
House | 04/17/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 1278 | |
House | 04/14/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1207 | |
House | 04/08/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 02/18/2009 | Referred to House Administration | Journal Page: 338 | |
House | 01/23/2009 | Filed |