House | 05/31/2009 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/28/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 5174 | |
House | 05/28/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 5174 | |
House | 05/28/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/27/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 05/25/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 4812 | |
House | 05/21/2009 | Filed |