House | 06/04/2009 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 06/01/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 6928 | |
House | 06/01/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 6928 | |
House | 05/29/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/05/2009 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 562 | |
House | 03/05/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/03/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 02/26/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 478 | |
House | 02/25/2009 | Filed |