House | 03/13/2009 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 03/12/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 658 | |
House | 03/12/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 658 | |
House | 03/12/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/02/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 513 | |
House | 02/27/2009 | Filed |