House | 04/08/2009 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1098 | |
House | 04/07/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 1098 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 927 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 855 | |
House | 03/18/2009 | Filed |