House | 04/03/2009 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1041 | |
House | 04/02/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1041 | |
House | 04/02/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 965 | |
House | 03/23/2009 | Filed |