Senate | 05/01/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1482 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1482 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Vote reconsidered | Journal Page: 1481 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Failed to pass to engrossment | Journal Page: 1474 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Motion to pass to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1474 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 1473 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Gallegos | Journal Page: 1473 |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1473 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1473 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1473 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 756 | |
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 725 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 473 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 473 | |
Senate | 02/20/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/20/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |