Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1021 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Gallegos S.B. No. 1021
 (In the Senate - Filed February 20, 2009; March 13, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; March 30, 2009, reported favorably by the following
 vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; March 30, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a prohibition on parking a commercial motor vehicle in
 certain residential subdivisions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 545.307, Transportation Code, is amended
 by amending Subsections (b) and (b-1) to read as follows:
 (b) Except as provided by Subsection (b-1), after 10 p.m.
 and before 6 a.m., a person may not park a commercial motor vehicle
 or leave the vehicle parked:
 (1)  in a private driveway that is located in a
 residential subdivision; or
 (2) on a street that is maintained by a county or
 municipality and for which signs are posted as provided by
 Subsection (c) if the street:
 (A) [(1)] is located within a residential
 subdivision; or
 (B) [(2)] is adjacent to a residential
 subdivision and within 1,000 feet of the property line of a
 residence, school, place of worship, or park.
 (b-1) A person may park a commercial motor vehicle or leave
 the vehicle parked in a private driveway that is located in a
 residential subdivision, or on a street for which signs are posted
 as provided by Subsection (c) if the commercial motor vehicle:
 (1) is transporting persons or property to or from the
 residential subdivision or performing work in the subdivision; and
 (2) remains parked in or adjacent to the subdivision
 only for the period necessary to complete the transportation or
 work.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *