E | 06/19/2009 | Effective on 9/1/09 | ||
E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5157 | |
E | 05/22/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2760 | |
House | 05/22/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4350 | |
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2732 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2759 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2638 | |
House | 05/20/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4125 | |
House | 05/20/2009 | Record vote | RV#1019 | Journal Page: 4124 |
House | 05/20/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 4124 | |
House | 05/20/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4124 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4050 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4050 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/15/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2135 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock | Journal Page: 1597 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1597 | |
House | 04/16/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1271 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1141 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1061 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1061 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1061 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1061 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1061 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1061 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1061 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 899 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/23/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/23/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/23/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/23/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 474 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 474 | |
Senate | 02/20/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/20/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |