Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1027 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 1027


 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of an interagency farm-to-school
 coordination task force.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 12, Agriculture Code, is amended by
 adding Section 12.0026 to read as follows:
 Sec. 12.0026.  INTERAGENCY FARM-TO-SCHOOL COORDINATION TASK
 FORCE. (a)  To promote a healthy diet for schoolchildren and the
 business of small to mid-sized local farms and ranches, the
 interagency farm-to-school coordination task force shall develop
 and implement a plan to facilitate the availability of locally
 grown food products in public schools.
 (b) The task force is composed of:
 (1) a representative of:
 (A)  the department, appointed by the
 commissioner;
 (B)  the Texas Education Agency, appointed by the
 commissioner of education; and
 (C)  the Department of State Health Services,
 appointed by the commissioner of state health services; and
 (2)  at least one representative of each of the
 following groups, appointed by the commissioner:
 (A) fruit and vegetable producer organizations;
 (B) school food service organizations;
 (C) food distribution businesses;
 (D) child nutrition and advocacy organizations;
 (E) parent organizations;
 (F)  educational institutions that conduct
 research in the areas of agriculture and nutrition; and
 (G)  health nutrition educators who serve school
 districts.
 (c)  A member of the task force serves at the will of the
 official who appointed the member.
 (d)  The representative of the department serves as
 presiding officer. The task force may elect other necessary
 officers from its members.
 (e)  The task force shall meet at the call of the presiding
 officer.
 (f)  The agency whose commissioner appoints a member is
 responsible for the expenses of a member's service on the task
 force. A member of the task force is not entitled to additional
 compensation for serving on the task force.
 (g)  Each appropriate agency or group represented on the task
 force shall provide the personnel and resources necessary to
 implement a task force measure under this section.
 (h) The task force shall:
 (1)  design new education resources, or review or
 update existing resources, on nutrition and food education that may
 be used by schools and school districts;
 (2)  expand food-focused experiential education
 programs;
 (3)  offer assistance in identifying funding sources
 and grants that allow schools and school districts to recover the
 costs associated with purchasing locally grown food products;
 (4)  develop a database of available locally grown food
 products for use by school food service agencies that includes
 contact and purchasing information for the products;
 (5)  identify, design, or make available training
 programs to enable local farmers and ranchers to market their
 products to schools and school districts, including programs
 related to:
 (A) crop production;
 (B) marketing of crops;
 (C) postharvest handling of crops;
 (D) food safety;
 (E) business management;
 (F) liability and risk management; and
 (G)  other topics deemed appropriate by the task
 force;
 (6)  advise schools and school districts on methods by
 which a school or school district may improve its facilities to
 allow for the use of minimally processed, fresh, and locally
 produced foods in school meals;
 (7)  provide technical assistance to school food
 service agencies to establish procedures, recipes, menu rotations,
 and other internal processes that accommodate the use of locally
 grown foods in public schools;
 (8)  offer advanced skills development training to
 school food service employees regarding the proper methods of
 handling, preparing, and serving locally grown foods; and
 (9)  conduct any other activity considered by the task
 force as necessary to achieve its goals under this section.
 (i)  The task force may solicit and accept gifts, grants, and
 donations from public and private entities to use for the purposes
 of this section.
 (j)  The task force may use any existing program or procedure
 that it determines to be useful in performing its duties under this
 section.
 SECTION 2. (a) Not later than December 1, 2009, the
 Department of Agriculture shall establish the interagency
 farm-to-school coordination task force as required by Section
 12.0026, Agriculture Code, as added by this Act.
 (b) Not later than February 1, 2010, the commissioners of
 the Department of Agriculture, the Texas Education Agency, and the
 Department of State Health Services shall appoint members of the
 interagency farm-to-school coordination task force, as required by
 Section 12.0026, Agriculture Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1027 passed the Senate on
 April 16, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1027 passed the House on
 May 20, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 122, Nays 21, two
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor