E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5157
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
House
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6968
|
Senate
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5038
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6039
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4723
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4723
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4195
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1379
|
Journal Page: 5180
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5180
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4091
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4358
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4358
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4314
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4314
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4314
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2710
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2710
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2710
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2710
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2709
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2464
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#875
|
Journal Page: 3723
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3723
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3723
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3687
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3687
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB1359
|
Journal Page: 3687
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3801
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Referred to Elections
|
|
Journal Page: 1597
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1597
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1271
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1141
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1061
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1061
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1061
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1061
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1061
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1061
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1061
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1016
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 921
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2009
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 486
|
Senate
|
03/13/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 486
|
Senate
|
02/26/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|