Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1152 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 1152


 AN ACT
 relating to the making or acceptance of political contributions in
 a courthouse; providing penalties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 253.039, Election Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a), (b), and (c) and adding Subsection (h) to
 read as follows:
 (a) A person may not knowingly make or authorize a political
 contribution while in the Capitol or a courthouse to:
 (1) a candidate or officeholder;
 (2) a political committee; or
 (3) a person acting on behalf of a candidate,
 officeholder, or political committee.
 (b) A candidate, officeholder, or political committee or a
 person acting on behalf of a candidate, officeholder, or political
 committee may not knowingly accept a political contribution, and
 shall refuse a political contribution that is received, in the
 Capitol or a courthouse.
 (c) This section does not prohibit contributions made in the
 Capitol or a courthouse through the United States postal service or
 a common or contract carrier.
 (h)  In this section, "courthouse" means any building owned
 by the state, a county, or a municipality, or an office or part of a
 building leased to the state, a county, or a municipality, in which
 a justice or judge sits to conduct court proceedings.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1152 passed the Senate on
 April 16, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0;
 May 21, 2009, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 23, 2009, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 30, 2009, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31,
 Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1152 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 15, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144,
 Nays 0, one present not voting; May 23, 2009, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 28, 2009, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor