E
|
06/19/2009
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5158
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
House
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6968
|
Senate
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5038
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6039
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4741
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4741
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4672
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6013
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6012
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4503
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4413
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4413
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4314
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4314
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4314
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2711
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2711
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2711
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2711
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2710
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2368
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3309
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#787
|
Journal Page: 3309
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3309
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3309
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3289
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3289
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3289
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 1958
|
Journal Page: 3289
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3041
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Referred to Corrections
|
|
Journal Page: 1597
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1597
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1183
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1013
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 988
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 988
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 988
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 988
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 988
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 988
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 988
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 838
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 491
|
Senate
|
03/13/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 491
|
Senate
|
02/27/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|