1 | 1 | | S.B. No. 1206 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to the release from the Texas Department of Criminal |
---|
6 | 6 | | Justice of certain inmates who complete a rehabilitation program. |
---|
7 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Section 508.141, Government Code, is amended by |
---|
9 | 9 | | adding Subsections (b-1), (d-1), and (d-2) and amending Subsection |
---|
10 | 10 | | (d) to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 11 | | (b-1) If a parole panel requires, as a condition of release, |
---|
12 | 12 | | that an inmate complete a specific department rehabilitation |
---|
13 | 13 | | program before release, the department shall place the inmate in |
---|
14 | 14 | | the program specified by the parole panel, except that the |
---|
15 | 15 | | department may place the inmate in a different program with the |
---|
16 | 16 | | approval of the parole panel. |
---|
17 | 17 | | (d) A parole panel may release an inmate on parole during |
---|
18 | 18 | | the parole month established for the inmate, or during any |
---|
19 | 19 | | applicable range of dates established under Subsection (d-1), if |
---|
20 | 20 | | the panel determines that the inmate's release will not increase |
---|
21 | 21 | | the likelihood of harm to the public. |
---|
22 | 22 | | (d-1) A parole panel that, as a condition of release, |
---|
23 | 23 | | requires an inmate to complete a specific department rehabilitation |
---|
24 | 24 | | program shall specify a range of dates, based on the date the inmate |
---|
25 | 25 | | is likely to have completed the specified program, during which the |
---|
26 | 26 | | department may release the inmate, if the inmate has: |
---|
27 | 27 | | (1) successfully completed the program specified by |
---|
28 | 28 | | the parole panel; and |
---|
29 | 29 | | (2) satisfied all other conditions of release |
---|
30 | 30 | | specified by the parole panel. |
---|
31 | 31 | | (d-2) The range of dates specified by the parole panel under |
---|
32 | 32 | | Subsection (d-1) may not begin earlier than the 45th day before any |
---|
33 | 33 | | applicable release date established for the inmate and must be a |
---|
34 | 34 | | range of at least 30 days. |
---|
35 | 35 | | SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies to any |
---|
36 | 36 | | inmate who is confined in a facility operated by or under contract |
---|
37 | 37 | | with the Texas Department of Criminal Justice on or after the |
---|
38 | 38 | | effective date of this Act, regardless of when the inmate's period |
---|
39 | 39 | | of confinement began. |
---|
40 | 40 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
41 | 41 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
42 | 42 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
43 | 43 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1206 passed the Senate on |
---|
44 | 44 | | April 9, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; |
---|
45 | 45 | | May 21, 2009, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and |
---|
46 | 46 | | requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 23, 2009, House |
---|
47 | 47 | | granted request of the Senate; May 30, 2009, Senate adopted |
---|
48 | 48 | | Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31, |
---|
49 | 49 | | Nays 0. |
---|
50 | 50 | | ______________________________ |
---|
51 | 51 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
52 | 52 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1206 passed the House, with |
---|
53 | 53 | | amendments, on May 13, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 140, |
---|
54 | 54 | | Nays 1, one present not voting; May 23, 2009, House granted request |
---|
55 | 55 | | of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee; |
---|
56 | 56 | | May 30, 2009, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the |
---|
57 | 57 | | following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 0, two present not voting. |
---|
58 | 58 | | ______________________________ |
---|
59 | 59 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
60 | 60 | | Approved: |
---|
61 | 61 | | ______________________________ |
---|
62 | 62 | | Date |
---|
63 | 63 | | ______________________________ |
---|
64 | 64 | | Governor |
---|