S.B. No. 1206 AN ACT relating to the release from the Texas Department of Criminal Justice of certain inmates who complete a rehabilitation program. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 508.141, Government Code, is amended by adding Subsections (b-1), (d-1), and (d-2) and amending Subsection (d) to read as follows: (b-1) If a parole panel requires, as a condition of release, that an inmate complete a specific department rehabilitation program before release, the department shall place the inmate in the program specified by the parole panel, except that the department may place the inmate in a different program with the approval of the parole panel. (d) A parole panel may release an inmate on parole during the parole month established for the inmate, or during any applicable range of dates established under Subsection (d-1), if the panel determines that the inmate's release will not increase the likelihood of harm to the public. (d-1) A parole panel that, as a condition of release, requires an inmate to complete a specific department rehabilitation program shall specify a range of dates, based on the date the inmate is likely to have completed the specified program, during which the department may release the inmate, if the inmate has: (1) successfully completed the program specified by the parole panel; and (2) satisfied all other conditions of release specified by the parole panel. (d-2) The range of dates specified by the parole panel under Subsection (d-1) may not begin earlier than the 45th day before any applicable release date established for the inmate and must be a range of at least 30 days. SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies to any inmate who is confined in a facility operated by or under contract with the Texas Department of Criminal Justice on or after the effective date of this Act, regardless of when the inmate's period of confinement began. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1206 passed the Senate on April 9, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; May 21, 2009, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 23, 2009, House granted request of the Senate; May 30, 2009, Senate adopted Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1206 passed the House, with amendments, on May 13, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 140, Nays 1, one present not voting; May 23, 2009, House granted request of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee; May 30, 2009, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 0, two present not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House Approved: ______________________________ Date ______________________________ Governor