Senate | 04/27/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1616 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1610 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Meeting cancelled | ||
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 547 | |
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 547 | |
Senate | 03/03/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/03/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |