Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1265 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Watson S.B. No. 1265
 (In the Senate - Filed March 3, 2009; March 17, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Finance; April 24, 2009,
 reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 10, Nays 0;
 April 24, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to obtaining an exemption from the motor vehicle sales tax
 for motor vehicles driven by persons who have orthopedic handicaps.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 152.086, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsections (b-1) and (d) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  The seller of a motor vehicle may not collect the tax
 from the purchaser of the motor vehicle if the purchaser:
 (1)  signs at the time of the purchase an exemption
 certificate that:
 (A)  is on a form designated by the comptroller;
 and
 (B)  contains all information the comptroller
 considers reasonable to establish qualification for the exemption
 at the time of sale; and
 (2)  presents any other documentation or information
 the comptroller requires by rule.
 (d) Notwithstanding any other provision of this section or of
 other law, a seller may rely on a properly executed and signed
 exemption certificate as provided by this section and is under no
 duty to investigate the propriety of a certificate that is valid on
 its face.  A seller who relies on a properly executed and signed
 exemption certificate as provided by this section is not liable for
 motor vehicle sales tax that would otherwise be due as a result of a
 motor vehicle sale.
 SECTION 2. Not later than December 1, 2009, the comptroller
 of public accounts shall:
 (1) adopt any rules necessary to implement the changes
 in law made by this Act; and
 (2) designate the form required by Paragraph (A),
 Subdivision (1), Subsection (b-1), Section 152.086, Tax Code, as
 added by this Act, and make the form available to motor vehicle
 dealers and the public.
 SECTION 3. The changes in law made by this Act apply to the
 sale of a motor vehicle on or after January 1, 2010. A sale of a
 motor vehicle that occurs before that date is governed by the law in
 effect on the date the sale occurred, and that law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *