1 | 1 | | By: Watson S.B. No. 1265 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Filed March 3, 2009; March 17, 2009, read |
---|
3 | 3 | | first time and referred to Committee on Finance; April 24, 2009, |
---|
4 | 4 | | reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 10, Nays 0; |
---|
5 | 5 | | April 24, 2009, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
9 | 9 | | AN ACT |
---|
10 | 10 | | relating to obtaining an exemption from the motor vehicle sales tax |
---|
11 | 11 | | for motor vehicles driven by persons who have orthopedic handicaps. |
---|
12 | 12 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
13 | 13 | | SECTION 1. Section 152.086, Tax Code, is amended by adding |
---|
14 | 14 | | Subsections (b-1) and (d) to read as follows: |
---|
15 | 15 | | (b-1) The seller of a motor vehicle may not collect the tax |
---|
16 | 16 | | from the purchaser of the motor vehicle if the purchaser: |
---|
17 | 17 | | (1) signs at the time of the purchase an exemption |
---|
18 | 18 | | certificate that: |
---|
19 | 19 | | (A) is on a form designated by the comptroller; |
---|
20 | 20 | | and |
---|
21 | 21 | | (B) contains all information the comptroller |
---|
22 | 22 | | considers reasonable to establish qualification for the exemption |
---|
23 | 23 | | at the time of sale; and |
---|
24 | 24 | | (2) presents any other documentation or information |
---|
25 | 25 | | the comptroller requires by rule. |
---|
26 | 26 | | (d) Notwithstanding any other provision of this section or of |
---|
27 | 27 | | other law, a seller may rely on a properly executed and signed |
---|
28 | 28 | | exemption certificate as provided by this section and is under no |
---|
29 | 29 | | duty to investigate the propriety of a certificate that is valid on |
---|
30 | 30 | | its face. A seller who relies on a properly executed and signed |
---|
31 | 31 | | exemption certificate as provided by this section is not liable for |
---|
32 | 32 | | motor vehicle sales tax that would otherwise be due as a result of a |
---|
33 | 33 | | motor vehicle sale. |
---|
34 | 34 | | SECTION 2. Not later than December 1, 2009, the comptroller |
---|
35 | 35 | | of public accounts shall: |
---|
36 | 36 | | (1) adopt any rules necessary to implement the changes |
---|
37 | 37 | | in law made by this Act; and |
---|
38 | 38 | | (2) designate the form required by Paragraph (A), |
---|
39 | 39 | | Subdivision (1), Subsection (b-1), Section 152.086, Tax Code, as |
---|
40 | 40 | | added by this Act, and make the form available to motor vehicle |
---|
41 | 41 | | dealers and the public. |
---|
42 | 42 | | SECTION 3. The changes in law made by this Act apply to the |
---|
43 | 43 | | sale of a motor vehicle on or after January 1, 2010. A sale of a |
---|
44 | 44 | | motor vehicle that occurs before that date is governed by the law in |
---|
45 | 45 | | effect on the date the sale occurred, and that law is continued in |
---|
46 | 46 | | effect for that purpose. |
---|
47 | 47 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
48 | 48 | | * * * * * |
---|