Senate | 04/30/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1140 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 555 | |
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 555 | |
Senate | 03/04/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/04/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |