By: Carona S.B. No. 1351 (In the Senate - Filed March 4, 2009; March 17, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Homeland Security; April 17, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 17, 2009, sent to printer.) COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1351 By: Carona A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the terms of the members of the Texas Transportation Commission. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Effective January 1, 2010, Section 201.052, Transportation Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 201.052. TERMS. Members of the commission serve two-year [staggered six-year] terms, with the terms [of either one or two members] expiring February 1 of each odd-numbered year. SECTION 2. Effective January 1, 2014, Section 201.052, Transportation Code, is reenacted to read as follows: Sec. 201.052. TERMS. Members of the commission serve staggered six-year terms, with the terms of either one or two members expiring February 1 of each odd-numbered year. SECTION 3. The term of a member of the Texas Transportation Commission serving on December 31, 2010, expires on February 1, 2011. SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009. * * * * *