1 | 1 | | By: Carona S.B. No. 1351 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Filed March 4, 2009; March 17, 2009, read |
---|
3 | 3 | | first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Homeland |
---|
4 | 4 | | Security; April 17, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
5 | 5 | | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; |
---|
6 | 6 | | April 17, 2009, sent to printer.) |
---|
7 | 7 | | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1351 By: Carona |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
11 | 11 | | AN ACT |
---|
12 | 12 | | relating to the terms of the members of the Texas Transportation |
---|
13 | 13 | | Commission. |
---|
14 | 14 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
15 | 15 | | SECTION 1. Effective January 1, 2010, Section 201.052, |
---|
16 | 16 | | Transportation Code, is amended to read as follows: |
---|
17 | 17 | | Sec. 201.052. TERMS. Members of the commission serve |
---|
18 | 18 | | two-year [staggered six-year] terms, with the terms [of either one |
---|
19 | 19 | | or two members] expiring February 1 of each odd-numbered year. |
---|
20 | 20 | | SECTION 2. Effective January 1, 2014, Section 201.052, |
---|
21 | 21 | | Transportation Code, is reenacted to read as follows: |
---|
22 | 22 | | Sec. 201.052. TERMS. Members of the commission serve |
---|
23 | 23 | | staggered six-year terms, with the terms of either one or two |
---|
24 | 24 | | members expiring February 1 of each odd-numbered year. |
---|
25 | 25 | | SECTION 3. The term of a member of the Texas Transportation |
---|
26 | 26 | | Commission serving on December 31, 2010, expires on February 1, |
---|
27 | 27 | | 2011. |
---|
28 | 28 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
29 | 29 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
30 | 30 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
31 | 31 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
32 | 32 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
33 | 33 | | * * * * * |
---|