Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1351 Senate Committee Report / Analysis

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    BILL ANALYSIS     Senate Research Center C.S.S.B. 1351  By: Carona  Transportation & Homeland Security  4/16/2009  Committee Report (Substituted)     AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT   Current law provides that members of the Texas Transportation Commission (TTC) serve staggered six-year terms, with the terms expiring in February of odd-numbered years.    C.S.S.B. 1351 amends current law relating to the terms of the members of the Texas Transportation Commission.   RULEMAKING AUTHORITY   This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.   SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS   SECTION 1. Amends Section 201.052, Transportation Code, effective January 1, 2010, as follows:   Sec. 201.052. TERMS. Provides that members of the Texas Transportation Commission (TTC) serve two-year terms, with the terms expiring February 1 of each odd-numbered year. Deletes existing text providing that members of TTC serve staggered six-year terms, with the terms of either one or two members expiring February 1 of each odd-numbered year.    SECTION 2. Amends Section 201.052, Transportation Code, effective January 1, 2014, as follows:   Sec. 201.052. TERMS. Provides that TTC members serve staggered six-year terms, with the terms of either one or two members expiring February 1 of each odd-numbered year.   SECTION 3. Provides that the term of a member of TTC serving on December 31, 2010, expires on February 1, 2011.    SECTION 4. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2009.  

BILL ANALYSIS

 

 

Senate Research Center C.S.S.B. 1351

 By: Carona

 Transportation & Homeland Security

 4/16/2009

 Committee Report (Substituted)

 

 

AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT

 

Current law provides that members of the Texas Transportation Commission (TTC) serve staggered six-year terms, with the terms expiring in February of odd-numbered years. 

 

C.S.S.B. 1351 amends current law relating to the terms of the members of the Texas Transportation Commission.

 

RULEMAKING AUTHORITY

 

This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.

 

SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS

 

SECTION 1. Amends Section 201.052, Transportation Code, effective January 1, 2010, as follows:

 

Sec. 201.052. TERMS. Provides that members of the Texas Transportation Commission (TTC) serve two-year terms, with the terms expiring February 1 of each odd-numbered year. Deletes existing text providing that members of TTC serve staggered six-year terms, with the terms of either one or two members expiring February 1 of each odd-numbered year. 

 

SECTION 2. Amends Section 201.052, Transportation Code, effective January 1, 2014, as follows:

 

Sec. 201.052. TERMS. Provides that TTC members serve staggered six-year terms, with the terms of either one or two members expiring February 1 of each odd-numbered year.

 

SECTION 3. Provides that the term of a member of TTC serving on December 31, 2010, expires on February 1, 2011. 

 

SECTION 4. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2009.