Senate | 05/05/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 2049 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 572 | |
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 572 | |
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |