Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1536 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 By: Uresti S.B. No. 1536
22 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2009; March 17, 2009, read
33 first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services;
44 May 5, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
55 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 5, 2009, sent
66 to printer.)
77 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1536 By: Uresti
88
99
1010 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
1111 AN ACT
1212 relating to preferred drug lists adopted by the Health and Human
1313 Services Commission and associated requirements regarding
1414 supplemental rebates, prior authorization, and public
1515 notification.
1616 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1717 SECTION 1. Section 531.071, Government Code, is amended by
1818 amending Subsection (c) and adding Subsection (d) to read as
1919 follows:
2020 (c) General information about the aggregate costs of
2121 different classes of drugs is not confidential under Subsection
2222 (a), except that a drug name or information that could reveal a drug
2323 name is confidential.
2424 (d) Information about whether the commission and a
2525 manufacturer or labeler reached or did not reach a supplemental
2626 rebate agreement under Section 531.070 for a particular drug is not
2727 confidential under Subsection (a).
2828 SECTION 2. Section 531.072, Government Code, is amended by
2929 adding Subsections (b-1), (b-2), and (c-1) to read as follows:
3030 (b-1) Notwithstanding Subsection (b), the preferred drug
3131 lists may contain:
3232 (1) a drug provided by a manufacturer or labeler that
3333 has not reached a supplemental rebate agreement with the commission
3434 if the commission determines that inclusion of the drug on the
3535 preferred drug lists will have no negative cost impact to the state;
3636 or
3737 (2) a drug provided by a manufacturer or labeler that
3838 has reached an agreement with the commission to provide program
3939 benefits in lieu of supplemental rebates, as described by Section
4040 531.070.
4141 (b-2) Consideration must be given to including all
4242 strengths and dosage forms of a drug on the preferred drug lists.
4343 (c-1) In addition to the considerations listed under
4444 Subsection (c), the commission shall consider the inclusion of
4545 multiple methods of delivery within each drug class, including
4646 liquid, tablet, capsule, and orally disintegrating tablets.
4747 SECTION 3. Section 531.073, Government Code, is amended by
4848 adding Subsections (g) and (h) to read as follows:
4949 (g) The commission shall ensure that requests for prior
5050 authorization may be submitted by telephone, facsimile, or
5151 electronic communications through the Internet.
5252 (h) The commission shall provide an automated process that
5353 may be used to assess a Medicaid recipient's medical and drug claim
5454 history to determine whether the recipient's medical condition
5555 satisfies the applicable criteria for dispensing a drug without an
5656 additional prior authorization request.
5757 SECTION 4. Section 531.074, Government Code, is amended by
5858 amending Subsections (i) and (m) and adding Subsections (f-1) and
5959 (i-1) to read as follows:
6060 (f-1) The committee shall meet in public and shall permit
6161 public comment before voting on any changes in the preferred drug
6262 lists. Minutes of each meeting shall be made available to the
6363 public not later than the 10th business day after the date the
6464 minutes are approved. The committee may meet in executive session
6565 to discuss confidential information as described by Subsection (i).
6666 (i) The commission shall adopt rules governing the
6767 operation of the committee, including rules governing the
6868 procedures used by the committee for providing notice of a meeting
6969 and rules prohibiting the committee from discussing confidential
7070 information described by Section 531.071 in a public meeting. The
7171 committee shall comply with the rules adopted under this subsection
7272 and Subsection (i-1).
7373 (i-1) In addition to the rules under Subsection (i), the
7474 commission by rule shall require the committee or the committee's
7575 designee to present a summary of any clinical efficacy and safety
7676 information or analyses regarding a drug under consideration for a
7777 preferred drug list that is provided to the committee by a private
7878 entity that has contracted with the commission to provide the
7979 information. The committee or the committee's designee shall
8080 provide the summary in electronic form before the public meeting at
8181 which consideration of the drug occurs. Confidential information
8282 described by Section 531.071 must be omitted from the summary. The
8383 summary must be posted on the commission's Internet website.
8484 (m) The commission or the commission's agent shall publicly
8585 disclose, immediately after the committee deliberations conclude,
8686 each specific drug recommended for or against preferred drug list
8787 status for each drug class included in the preferred drug list for
8888 the Medicaid vendor drug program. The disclosure must be posted on
8989 the commission's Internet website not later than the 10th business
9090 day [made in writing] after the conclusion of committee
9191 deliberations that result in recommendations made to the executive
9292 commissioner regarding the placement of drugs on the preferred drug
9393 list. The public disclosure must include:
9494 (1) the general basis for the recommendation for each
9595 drug class; and
9696 (2) for each recommendation, whether a supplemental
9797 rebate agreement or a program benefit agreement was reached under
9898 Section 531.070.
9999 SECTION 5. Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is
100100 amended by adding Section 531.0741 to read as follows:
101101 Sec. 531.0741. PUBLICATION OF INFORMATION REGARDING
102102 COMMISSION DECISIONS ON PREFERRED DRUG LIST PLACEMENT. The
103103 commission shall publish on the commission's Internet website any
104104 decisions on preferred drug list placement, including:
105105 (1) a list of drugs reviewed and the commission's
106106 decision for or against placement on a preferred drug list of each
107107 drug reviewed;
108108 (2) for each recommendation, whether a supplemental
109109 rebate agreement or a program benefit agreement was reached under
110110 Section 531.070; and
111111 (3) the rationale for any departure from a
112112 recommendation of the pharmaceutical and therapeutics committee
113113 established under Section 531.074.
114114 SECTION 6. Not later than December 1, 2010, the executive
115115 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall
116116 implement Subsections (g) and (h), Section 531.073, Government
117117 Code, as added by this Act.
118118 SECTION 7. If before implementing any provision of this Act
119119 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
120120 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
121121 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
122122 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
123123 waiver or authorization is granted.
124124 SECTION 8. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
125125 * * * * *