Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1536 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Uresti S.B. No. 1536
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2009; March 17, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services;
 May 5, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 5, 2009, sent
 to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1536 By: Uresti


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to preferred drug lists adopted by the Health and Human
 Services Commission and associated requirements regarding
 supplemental rebates, prior authorization, and public
 notification.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 531.071, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (c) and adding Subsection (d) to read as
 follows:
 (c) General information about the aggregate costs of
 different classes of drugs is not confidential under Subsection
 (a), except that a drug name or information that could reveal a drug
 name is confidential.
 (d)  Information about whether the commission and a
 manufacturer or labeler reached or did not reach a supplemental
 rebate agreement under Section 531.070 for a particular drug is not
 confidential under Subsection (a).
 SECTION 2. Section 531.072, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (b-1), (b-2), and (c-1) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (b), the preferred drug
 lists may contain:
 (1)  a drug provided by a manufacturer or labeler that
 has not reached a supplemental rebate agreement with the commission
 if the commission determines that inclusion of the drug on the
 preferred drug lists will have no negative cost impact to the state;
 or
 (2)  a drug provided by a manufacturer or labeler that
 has reached an agreement with the commission to provide program
 benefits in lieu of supplemental rebates, as described by Section
 531.070.
 (b-2)  Consideration must be given to including all
 strengths and dosage forms of a drug on the preferred drug lists.
 (c-1)  In addition to the considerations listed under
 Subsection (c), the commission shall consider the inclusion of
 multiple methods of delivery within each drug class, including
 liquid, tablet, capsule, and orally disintegrating tablets.
 SECTION 3. Section 531.073, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (g) and (h) to read as follows:
 (g)  The commission shall ensure that requests for prior
 authorization may be submitted by telephone, facsimile, or
 electronic communications through the Internet.
 (h)  The commission shall provide an automated process that
 may be used to assess a Medicaid recipient's medical and drug claim
 history to determine whether the recipient's medical condition
 satisfies the applicable criteria for dispensing a drug without an
 additional prior authorization request.
 SECTION 4. Section 531.074, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (i) and (m) and adding Subsections (f-1) and
 (i-1) to read as follows:
 (f-1)  The committee shall meet in public and shall permit
 public comment before voting on any changes in the preferred drug
 lists. Minutes of each meeting shall be made available to the
 public not later than the 10th business day after the date the
 minutes are approved. The committee may meet in executive session
 to discuss confidential information as described by Subsection (i).
 (i) The commission shall adopt rules governing the
 operation of the committee, including rules governing the
 procedures used by the committee for providing notice of a meeting
 and rules prohibiting the committee from discussing confidential
 information described by Section 531.071 in a public meeting. The
 committee shall comply with the rules adopted under this subsection
 and Subsection (i-1).
 (i-1)  In addition to the rules under Subsection (i), the
 commission by rule shall require the committee or the committee's
 designee to present a summary of any clinical efficacy and safety
 information or analyses regarding a drug under consideration for a
 preferred drug list that is provided to the committee by a private
 entity that has contracted with the commission to provide the
 information. The committee or the committee's designee shall
 provide the summary in electronic form before the public meeting at
 which consideration of the drug occurs. Confidential information
 described by Section 531.071 must be omitted from the summary. The
 summary must be posted on the commission's Internet website.
 (m) The commission or the commission's agent shall publicly
 disclose, immediately after the committee deliberations conclude,
 each specific drug recommended for or against preferred drug list
 status for each drug class included in the preferred drug list for
 the Medicaid vendor drug program. The disclosure must be posted on
 the commission's Internet website not later than the 10th business
 day [made in writing] after the conclusion of committee
 deliberations that result in recommendations made to the executive
 commissioner regarding the placement of drugs on the preferred drug
 list. The public disclosure must include:
 (1)  the general basis for the recommendation for each
 drug class; and
 (2)  for each recommendation, whether a supplemental
 rebate agreement or a program benefit agreement was reached under
 Section 531.070.
 SECTION 5. Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 531.0741 to read as follows:
 Sec. 531.0741.  PUBLICATION OF INFORMATION REGARDING
 COMMISSION DECISIONS ON PREFERRED DRUG LIST PLACEMENT. The
 commission shall publish on the commission's Internet website any
 decisions on preferred drug list placement, including:
 (1)  a list of drugs reviewed and the commission's
 decision for or against placement on a preferred drug list of each
 drug reviewed;
 (2)  for each recommendation, whether a supplemental
 rebate agreement or a program benefit agreement was reached under
 Section 531.070; and
 (3)  the rationale for any departure from a
 recommendation of the pharmaceutical and therapeutics committee
 established under Section 531.074.
 SECTION 6. Not later than December 1, 2010, the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall
 implement Subsections (g) and (h), Section 531.073, Government
 Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 7. If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 8. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *