E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 5158
|
E
|
06/01/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6968
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4994
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4975
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5982
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4320
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4320
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4320
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4320
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2518
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3875
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#945
|
Journal Page: 3874
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3874
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3874
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3666
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3666
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Bohac
|
Journal Page: 3665
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3665
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 3165
|
Journal Page: 3665
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3301
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Referred to Business & Industry
|
|
Journal Page: 2427
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2427
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1928
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1712
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1649
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1649
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1649
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1649
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1649
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1649
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1648
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Postponed
|
1:15 PM
|
Journal Page: 1640
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1640
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1640
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1227
|
Senate
|
04/17/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2009
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 628
|
Senate
|
03/20/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 628
|
Senate
|
03/10/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|