1 | 1 | | S.B. No. 1717 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to regulation of owners of developments supported with low |
---|
6 | 6 | | income housing tax credit allocations and of housing sponsors of |
---|
7 | 7 | | certain multifamily housing developments. |
---|
8 | 8 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 9 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter L, Chapter 2306, Government Code, is |
---|
10 | 10 | | amended by adding Section 2306.2631 to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 11 | | Sec. 2306.2631. REPORTS BY SPONSORS OF CERTAIN MULTIFAMILY |
---|
12 | 12 | | HOUSING DEVELOPMENTS. (a) This section applies only to a housing |
---|
13 | 13 | | sponsor of a multifamily housing development that: |
---|
14 | 14 | | (1) receives financial assistance from the state; |
---|
15 | 15 | | (2) receives financial assistance from the federal |
---|
16 | 16 | | government, including an allocation of low income housing tax |
---|
17 | 17 | | credits; or |
---|
18 | 18 | | (3) is subject to a land use restriction agreement. |
---|
19 | 19 | | (b) The department by rule shall require the housing sponsor |
---|
20 | 20 | | of a multifamily housing development to submit a quarterly report |
---|
21 | 21 | | to the department. The report must include information that |
---|
22 | 22 | | identifies: |
---|
23 | 23 | | (1) the number of vacant units in the development at |
---|
24 | 24 | | the time of the report; and |
---|
25 | 25 | | (2) the number of days that each unit has been vacant. |
---|
26 | 26 | | (c) The department shall provide to each member of the |
---|
27 | 27 | | legislature, on request of that member, a report that disaggregates |
---|
28 | 28 | | the information collected under Subsection (b) by zip code in the |
---|
29 | 29 | | member's district. |
---|
30 | 30 | | SECTION 2. Subchapter DD, Chapter 2306, Government Code, is |
---|
31 | 31 | | amended by adding Section 2306.6736 to read as follows: |
---|
32 | 32 | | Sec. 2306.6736. PROHIBITED PRACTICES. |
---|
33 | 33 | | (a) Notwithstanding any other law, a development owner of a |
---|
34 | 34 | | development supported with a housing tax credit allocation may not: |
---|
35 | 35 | | (1) lock out or threaten to lock out any person |
---|
36 | 36 | | residing in the development except by judicial process unless the |
---|
37 | 37 | | exclusion results from: |
---|
38 | 38 | | (A) a necessity to perform bona fide repairs or |
---|
39 | 39 | | construction work; or |
---|
40 | 40 | | (B) an emergency; or |
---|
41 | 41 | | (2) seize or threaten to seize the personal property |
---|
42 | 42 | | of any person residing in the development except by judicial |
---|
43 | 43 | | process unless the resident has abandoned the premises. |
---|
44 | 44 | | (b) Each development owner shall: |
---|
45 | 45 | | (1) include a conspicuous provision in the lease |
---|
46 | 46 | | agreement prohibiting the owner from engaging in a practice |
---|
47 | 47 | | described by Subsection (a); and |
---|
48 | 48 | | (2) remove in the manner specified by department rule |
---|
49 | 49 | | any provisions in the lease agreement that are contrary to |
---|
50 | 50 | | Subsection (a). |
---|
51 | 51 | | SECTION 3. The Texas Department of Housing and Community |
---|
52 | 52 | | Affairs shall adopt rules as necessary to implement and enforce |
---|
53 | 53 | | Section 2306.6736, Government Code, as added by this Act, not later |
---|
54 | 54 | | than November 1, 2009. |
---|
55 | 55 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
56 | 56 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
57 | 57 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
58 | 58 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1717 passed the Senate on |
---|
59 | 59 | | April 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 28, Nays 3; and that |
---|
60 | 60 | | the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2009, by the |
---|
61 | 61 | | following vote: Yeas 28, Nays 3. |
---|
62 | 62 | | ______________________________ |
---|
63 | 63 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
64 | 64 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1717 passed the House, with |
---|
65 | 65 | | amendment, on May 18, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 89, |
---|
66 | 66 | | Nays 52, one present not voting. |
---|
67 | 67 | | ______________________________ |
---|
68 | 68 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
69 | 69 | | Approved: |
---|
70 | 70 | | ______________________________ |
---|
71 | 71 | | Date |
---|
72 | 72 | | ______________________________ |
---|
73 | 73 | | Governor |
---|