Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1717 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 1717


 AN ACT
 relating to regulation of owners of developments supported with low
 income housing tax credit allocations and of housing sponsors of
 certain multifamily housing developments.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter L, Chapter 2306, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2306.2631 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2306.2631.  REPORTS BY SPONSORS OF CERTAIN MULTIFAMILY
 HOUSING DEVELOPMENTS. (a)  This section applies only to a housing
 sponsor of a multifamily housing development that:
 (1) receives financial assistance from the state;
 (2)  receives financial assistance from the federal
 government, including an allocation of low income housing tax
 credits; or
 (3) is subject to a land use restriction agreement.
 (b)  The department by rule shall require the housing sponsor
 of a multifamily housing development to submit a quarterly report
 to the department. The report must include information that
 identifies:
 (1)  the number of vacant units in the development at
 the time of the report; and
 (2) the number of days that each unit has been vacant.
 (c)  The department shall provide to each member of the
 legislature, on request of that member, a report that disaggregates
 the information collected under Subsection (b) by zip code in the
 member's district.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter DD, Chapter 2306, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2306.6736 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2306.6736.  PROHIBITED PRACTICES.
 (a)  Notwithstanding any other law, a development owner of a
 development supported with a housing tax credit allocation may not:
 (1)  lock out or threaten to lock out any person
 residing in the development except by judicial process unless the
 exclusion results from:
 (A)  a necessity to perform bona fide repairs or
 construction work; or
 (B) an emergency; or
 (2)  seize or threaten to seize the personal property
 of any person residing in the development except by judicial
 process unless the resident has abandoned the premises.
 (b) Each development owner shall:
 (1)  include a conspicuous provision in the lease
 agreement prohibiting the owner from engaging in a practice
 described by Subsection (a); and
 (2)  remove in the manner specified by department rule
 any provisions in the lease agreement that are contrary to
 Subsection (a).
 SECTION 3. The Texas Department of Housing and Community
 Affairs shall adopt rules as necessary to implement and enforce
 Section 2306.6736, Government Code, as added by this Act, not later
 than November 1, 2009.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1717 passed the Senate on
 April 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 28, Nays 3; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 28, Nays 3.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1717 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 18, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 89,
 Nays 52, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor